Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1000 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14406 Week
» 67422 Month
» 186949 Year
» 3213802 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
71 |
m/e |
12/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
14502 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
54502 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1922 |
29A |
|
Perth South |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
63B |
|
Stirling |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
68B |
|
Dumfries |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
63B |
Stirling |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
ALLOC |
63A |
Perth South |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
68B |
Dumfries |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/05/1961 |
Beattock MPD |
In store are 54502/07; also here are 55234 an 57586. |
SLS/196106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 71 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22948 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 14502 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 54502 |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (63B) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (68B) |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 54502 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|