Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 112 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 7296 Month
» 315277 Year
» 1199658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44737   31/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 31/03/1949
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/01/1967
Scrapping During 07/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 17 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24E Blackpool Central 8w/e 14/06/1952
9K Bolton w/e 19/09/1964
8K Bank Hall w/e 14/05/1966
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 22/10/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 14/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 9K Bolton 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 5w/e 11/06/1966
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN   w/e 14/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/03/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 44737
Built at Crewe Works
   
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
14/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44737    
29/04/1967 Sightings A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
07/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev