Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 180 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 180 Week
» 14084 Month
» 322065 Year
» 1206446 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4772 m/e 05/1947
BR 44772 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 05/1947
Withdrawal During 10/1967
Scrapping During 05/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 20 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
32A Inverness 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 32A Inverness w/e 17/05/1947
LOAN 5A Crewe North w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 31/01/1948
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 29/04/1950
WDN 8A Edge Hill w/e 04/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1947 To Service To service as LMS Number 4772
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Inverness (32A)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44772    
10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44772    
05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev