Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 173 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 173 Week
» 14430 Month
» 242314 Year
» 1463879 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4839 m/e 09/1944
BR 44839 w/e 10/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/12/1966
Scrapping During 04/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1944
17A Derby 01/01/1948
22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 5w/e 16/07/1949
17A Derby 4w/e 03/10/1953
19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 16/06/1957
17A Derby 8w/e 05/10/1957
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 04/10/1958
17A Derby w/e 15/11/1958
21A Saltley w/e 21/11/1959
17A Derby w/e 07/04/1962
17B Burton w/e 22/09/1962
40E Colwick w/e 25/12/1965
9F Heaton Mersey w/e 28/05/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 10/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 18/06/1949
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 01/10/1953
LOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 03/10/1953
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region q/e 27/08/1956
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 05/10/1957
LOAN 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 04/10/1958
EXLOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 17B Burton 5w/e 06/10/1962
LOAN 16B Colwick 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 11/06/1966
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203
11/09/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 44658, 44680, 44807, 44839/64, 45134/449, 60007, 70039, 73069, 90318/65, 92234, E3004/35/9/45, D216/8/46, D328, D368, D370/4, D391, D1104-11, D1583/8, D1600/8/10/3/86, D1762/76, D1865; Electric Shop: E3018/38/44/54, 26055; Adjacent to Electric Shop: D204/37, D311, D1515/20/46, D1663/80, D1761, D1858/9/81, D1915, D5105, D5107/11, D5711/4, 27005; Test Area: D222/3/74, D336/43, D1501, D1688, D1727/69/96, D5246, D5717, D8049; Traverser Area: D217, D322, D1503, D1627/53/67/72, D1764, D1876, D1904, D8000/7, 26017, 70052, 71000. At side of Works: 45131/8, 70006/17, 90265/396, D1604, D1782, D1812, D5710. Paint Shop: D367, D1103, D5709, E3008, 44776, 44800, 60010, 26037. SLS/196610

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4839
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A)    
10/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44839    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
28/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
10/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 44839    

prev prev