Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 140 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4955 Week
» 11089 Month
» 238973 Year
» 1460538 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5089 m/e 04/1935
BR 45089 w/e 16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4632
To Service During 04/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/08/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 32 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1935
5B Crewe South 01/01/1948
6J Holyhead 4w/e 12/07/1958
1E Bletchley 4w/e 04/10/1958
2F Bescot w/e 14/03/1964
2D Banbury w/e 02/10/1965
6A Chester (MR) w/e 10/09/1966
5B Crewe South w/e 29/04/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 26/08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 2F Bescot 4w/e 04/04/1964
WDN   w/e 14/11/1964
ALLOC 2D Banbury 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 10/09/1966
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 06/05/1967
WDN   w/e 26/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1964 Crewe Works (Misc.) Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5089
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4632
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
16/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45089    
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
14/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (2D)    
10/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
26/08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45089    

prev prev