Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 163 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17966 Week
» 70982 Month
» 190509 Year
» 3217362 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5225 |
m/e |
08/1936 |
British Railways |
45225 |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1280 |
To Service |
During 08/1936 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1967 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/04/1962 |
Crewe South MPD (Ex Works) |
Waiting Works on 5B: 12009/19, 42677/8, 43681, 44364, 45418, 46144/9, 46205/7/10, 47213, 47547, 48964, 49158, 70016. Ex Works on 5B: 45116, 45225, 46117, 48732. |
SLS/196205 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5225 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1280 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45225 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45225 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|