Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1044 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7251 Week
» 4764 Month
» 232648 Year
» 1454213 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5271 m/e 11/1936
BR 45271 w/e 02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1326
To Service During 11/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/09/1967
Scrapping During 09/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 30 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1936
5B Crewe South 01/01/1948
8B Warrington Dallam 8w/e 11/07/1953
5A Crewe North 4w/e 03/10/1953
8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 31/10/1953
6H Bangor 4w/e 01/12/1956
8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 29/12/1956
12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 07/09/1957
8B Warrington Dallam 8w/e 05/10/1957
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 01/07/1961
8B Warrington Dallam w/e 29/07/1961
9D Newton Heath w/e 20/06/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 23/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 13/06/1953
LOAN 5A Crewe North 4w/e 03/10/1953
EXLOAN 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 31/10/1953
LOAN 6H Bangor 4w/e 01/12/1956
EXLOAN 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 29/12/1956
LOAN 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 07/09/1957
EXLOAN 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 23/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/05/1964 Crewe Works (Works Yard) Awaiting Works at Scrap Yard: 44835, 45064, 48053, 48354, 48717, 70022. Awaiting Scrap at Scrap Yard: 42897, 42922, 48140, 48209. Diesel Erecting Shop: D277, D342, D349, D6843, 26005, 26034, 26048. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D205, D210, D219, D241, D255, D274, D1582 painted, D1583, D1585 undercoat, D1609, D1610, D1611 shell only, 26047, 27006, 46457. Outside Erecting Shop: D254, 42081, 42410, 45080, 45112, 45217, 48528, 92156, 92177. Erecting Shop: D226, D248, D256, D315, D335, D336, D340, D1591 undercoat, D1592 nearly complete, D1593, D1594, D1595, D1596 motors mounted, D1597, D1598, D1599, D1600, D1601, D1602, D1603, D1604, D1605, D1606, D1607, D1608 shell only, D5719, D6789, D6794, D6884, D8050, 42055, 42085, 42394, 44665, 44873, 44884, 45132, 45147, 45182, 45336, 45354, 45415, 45647, 46436, 48211, 48258, 48313, 48424, 48746, 48749, 48759, 92026, 92030, 92085. Works Yard: 42583, 44662, 44872, 44898, 45000, 45271, 45558, 48070, 48171, 48371, 48462, 48538, 48602, 48613, 48684, 70010, 70024, 70049, 78002, 78007, 78017, 92062, 92102, 92126, 92154, 92166, 92227. Outside Paint Shop: D298, D1584 undercoat, D5717, D6775, D6863, D8002, D8027, 48742. Paint Shop: D1578 painted, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 undercoat, 26028. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5271
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1326
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
02/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45271    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
29/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
23/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45271    

prev prev