|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1950 | Derby Works | New work: On 31/3 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42140/41 were complete-No. 42140 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42142 had the frames and boiler erected and Nos. 42143/44 only the frames. Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 40419/86/95, 525/28, 40541, 628, 40633, 40910/35. 936, 41006/35/54/94, 41157/88/96/97, 41247, 1747, 1820, 42324, 2367/70/90, 42516/27/28, 3178/80, 3223/33, 3357/70/88, 3405, 3634/39, 43803/45, 3863, 43865/86, 43912, 3931/48/51, 43970, 3971, 4012/35/37, 44053, 4104, 44129, 4157/69, 44184/85, 44260, 44523, 4538, 44552/82, 4591, 45585, 7252, 22940, 58100, E.R. No. 8002, W.R. Nos. 2089, 2134/36. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40029, 40540, 40633, 41076. 41112, 42306/65, 58088. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41531. 41747, 41835. 43370, 43804, 44432/66, 47253, 47336, 47402/62, 47627/30, W.R. Nos. 2023, 2112, while Nos. 40015/34/47, 40937, 42346/92, 42405, 42507/12/25, 43180, 43223/28, 43605, 43863/67, 44053, 44104 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Nos. 58160 an 58299 appeared painted black, with plain tenders. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/2 Nos. 40533 an 1252: W/E 17/2 No. 1366. | SLS/195004 |
31/10/1954 | N.E. Miscellany | The 9.0 a.m. train from Sunderland to Newcastle continues to, provide an interesting variety of locomotives. New 2-6-0 B.R. Std. Class 3MT No. 77014 has been a fairly regular performer recently but on 23rd October, an A5 tank freshly out of Darlington works after repair, was on the train. Later that same day, a taper-boiler L.M.S. 2-6-4 tank hauled the 12.30 p.m. train from Sunderland to Newcastle. On 14th November, L.M.R. Jubilee No. 45585 was observed running northwards across Durham viaduct with an excursion bound for Newcastle. On 17th November, three new standard 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 80107/8/9 were observed at Stannington coupled together and in steam heading northwards en route for the Scottish Region. |
SLS/195412 |
31/10/1959 | Leicester. Mid. MPD | Leicester Midland (15C) now has six Jubilees on its allocation viz. 45585, 45615/6/22/36/50, having gained some Kentish Town 'diagrams'. | SLS/196003 |
02/11/1959 | Neasden MPD | From 2nd November, Jubilees 45585, 45628 an 45712 took over the principal expresses from B1s on the GC main line. | SLS/195912 |
28/11/1959 | Neasden MPD | The three Jubilees (45585/628/712) have been transferred to Kentish Town and replaced by Bls once again. | SLS/196001 |
25/11/1961 | Burton MPD | Eighteen Jubilees were transferred here on 25th November in exchange for Class 4Fs, although it is believed all are to be stored viz. 45557/79/85/98, 45610/1/2/5/8/20/6/36/41/8/9/50/67/8. | SLS/196201 |
05/07/1964 | Derby MPD (Stored) | Awaiting Works: D1688. Ex Works: D1749, D1750, D5282/3/4, D5794, 12031/79. Also on 16C. D2859, 92071/158/81/239, 90579/652. Stored: 44172/333, 45585. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/12/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5585, name: HYDERABAD Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24143 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45585 | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) | ||
24/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
10/08/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) | ||
03/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
21/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) | ||
16/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
01/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
23/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
18/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
26/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
09/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45585 | ||
11/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |