|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/11/1964 | Crewe South MPD (Stored) | Ex-Works: 45392, 48458, 48721/45, 92231; Waiting Works: 42468, 42588, 42616, 44773, 45300, 45733, 47354, 47467, 46499, 48001, 48385, 48505, 48697, 48708, 70001/39, 80125, 92160; Stored: 43151, 45553, 45586; Also on shed: 5063, 6819/77, 7023, 7914. | SLS/196412 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/12/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5586, name: MYSORE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24144 |
||
08/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) | ||
11/04/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) | ||
07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45586 | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
26/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
13/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
04/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
12/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
06/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) | ||
11/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
17/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
04/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
23/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45586 | ||
04/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |