01/02/1958 |
LMR regional adjustments |
In connection with the Regional adjustments as from 1st February, the Depot Code for Carlisle (Upperby) has been altered from 12A to 12B. The following locomotives are affected: D3170, 12083, 13087/8, 13171, 40628/9/56, 42426/30, 42539/94, 42664, 43896, 44060/81, 44121/6, 44346, 44936/9, 45041/70, 45106/40/84/5/97, 45244/6/8/58/9 86/93/5/6, 45315/6/7/23/9/48/51/68/71/82/94/7, 45402/9/12/4/31/7/8/45/51/94, 45500/2/4/6/8/12/3/24/6/37/41/2/3/9/51/88/93/6/9, 45613/66, 45723,46106/26/36/41/8/65/7, 46226/38/55, 46449, 47292/5, 47326/40/77/91,47408/15, 47602/14/8/64/6. |
SLS/195802 |
16/01/1966 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 44834/856, 45073/212/87/318. 45593 (repaint), 48340/723, 70005/11/40/5, 92013/32/71/90, D238, D249, D275, D296, D315/31/2/78/81, D1508/31/47/9/98, D1692, D1710, D8012 and D1991-1999, D1100; Electric shop: E3014/41/9/67, E26020/43, E27001; 'new' shop: D1533, D1617/36/81, D1754, D1803, D1970. Traverser area: D214, D243/92, D399, D5706/15/6, D8005, D1500/3/41/6/80, D160/83/94. 01700/51/64, D1840; Test area: D243/4, D1527/35/61/82. Old Cutting-up shop: D1515/73, D1788, D8016, E3045, D257. Waiting Works: 45350, 48683, 92020/208. Paint shop: 46235 (inside), D245, D252, D380, D1579, D1985-1990, D5709, 44871, 70051, 92107, 71000 (stored). |
SLS/196602 |
02/07/1967 |
Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Holbeck) |
Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). |
SLS/196708 |
09/09/1967 |
Eastern Region (North) Steam Locomotive Stock |
No less than 90 steam locomotives were withdrawn in September and the total steam stock at the 1st October, 1967, was reduced to 21 as under:- 1 C1.5 4-6-0 (45208 at Low Moor). 2 Jubilees (45562 Alberta and 45593 Kolhapur at Holbeck). 1 K1 2-6-0 (62005 at Holbeck-transferred from Tyne Dock). 17 8F 2-8-0 (48055/67/70/76/84/93, 48113/69, 48222/76, 48352, 48439/73, 48537/40, 48622/64-all at Royston). The following classes are now extinct:-W.D. 2-8-0, Q6 0-8-0, B1 4-6-0, J27 0-6-0 and Stanier and Fairburn 2-cyl. 2-6-4Ts. 65882 (J27) was the last North Eastern Railway locomotive and the last of the pre-grouping companies' standard gauge locomotives to remain in service. No locomotives at all remain in the wheel classification 0-8-0, 0-6-0 and 2-6-4T. The number of tanks in British Railways stock at 1st October is 7 ! (three LMS 0-6-0Ts and one LNE J94 0-6-OST at Westhouses and three GW narrow gauge 2-6-2Ts for the Vale of Rheidol at Aberystwyth). (Ed. Since the above was compiled, 45593 has arrived at Tyseley (Birmingham) for repainting and the three LMS 0-6-0Ts and the J94 were taken out of traffic on 4th October, when an N.C.B. diesel commenced work at Williamthorpe Colliery). |
SLS/196711 |