31/03/1948 |
Crewe Works |
Two more Class '5' 4-6-0's of order E468 have been completed: No. 4753 on 12/3 and 4754 on 20/3. No. 4755, the first of three Caprotti engines to be fitted with a double chimney and electric lighting, is nearing completion and should be in traffic by the end of April. Owing to the irregular supply of roller bearing axleboxes, due no doubt to the shortage of material, the construction of Nos. 4756/7 is held up, and work has therefore started on the first two engines of order E469, Nos. 4738/9, the frames of which are in the Erecting Shop. The latest 'Royal Scot' conversion is No. 6154 , completed on 27/3, to be followed by Nos. 6105/37; the former is nearing completion and will probably be in traffic by the end of April. Several more ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap heap recently, they were cut-up as follows:-Nos. 6636 W/E 27/3, 6682 W E 10/4; 6930 W/E 13/3, 7682 W/E 20/3, 27636 W/E 3/4 and 27664 W/E 3/4. The first engines to be re-numbered at Crewe (by the addition of 40000 to the existing number) were done during the W/E 3/4, the engines being Nos. 4754, 5069, 5292, 5411 an 5530 . The numerals on the cab sides are of the Gill Sans type, about nine inches in height. |
SLS/194805 |
31/12/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New Work December: 'IVĀ° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with. Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque. |
SLS/194902 |
27/03/1954 |
Crewe Works |
On 27th March two sets of frames were ready for rebuilt Scots Nos. 46148 an 46156. The old frames of No. 46148 were in the old Erecting Shop with the name-plate still attached; No. 46137 was also there but it was not clear if she had just come in or was ready to leave, still unrebuilt. |
SLS/195405 |
07/01/1961 |
Trafford Park MPD |
70004/14/5/7/21/32/3/42 have been transferred to Willesden and replaced by 45540, 46106/22/37/41/3/53/8. On Saturday, 7th January, 70004 worked the 12-34 p.m. Watford-New St. Birmingham and returned on the 7-37 p.m. New St.-Euston. |
SLS/196102 |
08/01/1961 |
Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. |
SLS/196102 |