Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 14 Today
» 772 Yesterday
» 3436 Week
» 15214 Month
» 304606 Year
» 815708 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6201   03/11/1933
BR 46201   07/08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/11/1933 PRINCESS ELIZABETH

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LMS Red   03/11/1933
LMS Black   08/1947
BR Black Red and White 02/1948
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Princess Royal
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 03/11/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/10/1962 off Carlisle Upperby (12B)
Total Mileage 1,526,807
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LMS 9t Riveted 9001 03/11/1933 LMS 4,000g 9t 0cwt
LMS 9t Riveted 9066 28/03/1935 LMS 4,000g 9t 0cwt
LMS 9t Riveted 9065 20/06/1936 LMS 4,000g 9t 0cwt
LMS 10t Riveted 9373 28/11/1936 LMS 4,000g 10t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Preserved: Sold to Mr Bell (Elizabethan Society), 13th February 1963

Allocations
Code Name From Date
W1 (New) 03/11/1933
27A Polmadie 06/01/1934
1B Camden 24/06/1939
9A Longsight 15/07/1939
1B Camden 16/09/1939
8A Edge Hill 21/10/1939
5A Crewe North 05/10/1940
8A Edge Hill 20/05/1944
5A Crewe North 24/03/1945
8A Edge Hill 11/12/1948
5A Crewe North 13/06/1953
66A Polmadie 05/07/1958
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 11/03/1961
12B Carlisle Upperby 27/01/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 20/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 11/12/1948
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 13/06/1953
LOAN 66A Polmadie 4w/e 12/07/1958
LOAN 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 09/08/1958
TOSTORE 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 01/04/1961
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 27/01/1962
WDN   w/e 20/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/10/1957 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Crewe Works 16/03/1934 29/03/1934 14 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 01/05/1934 15/05/1934 15 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 24/07/1934 02/08/1934 10 days Light Service  
Crewe Works 11/12/1934 21/12/1934 11 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 12/03/1935 28/03/1935 17 days Light Ordinary
Tender number 9066 (LMS 9t Riveted) attached.
 
Crewe Works 10/10/1935 03/12/1935 55 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 10/01/1936 31/01/1936 22 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 13/04/1936 23/04/1936 11 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 24/10/1936 07/11/1936 15 days Heavy Service  
Crewe Works 04/09/1937 29/10/1937 56 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 10/07/1938 15/08/1938 37 days Light Service  
Crewe Works 13/05/1939 29/05/1939 17 days Heavy Service  
Crewe Works 21/08/1939 02/09/1939 13 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 07/02/1940 19/03/1940 42 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 07/05/1940 11/05/1940 5 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 20/09/1940 12/10/1940 23 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 04/06/1941 25/06/1941 22 days Light Service  
Crewe Works 26/02/1942 30/04/1942 64 days Light Service  
Crewe Works 05/09/1942 03/10/1942 29 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 04/02/1943 18/03/1943 43 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 28/10/1943 31/12/1943 65 days Heavy Service  
Crewe Works 21/04/1944 27/04/1944 7 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 13/06/1944 28/07/1944 46 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 28/12/1944 08/02/1945 43 days Light Service  
Crewe Works 31/10/1945 08/12/1945 39 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 14/12/1945 01/01/1946 19 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 27/06/1946 07/08/1946 42 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 17/09/1946 05/12/1946 80 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 14/06/1947 15/08/1947 63 days Heavy Service
Painted
 
Crewe Works 04/10/1947 22/10/1947 19 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 10/02/1948 08/03/1948 28 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 26/06/1948 03/08/1948 39 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 23/10/1948 16/12/1948 55 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 17/06/1949 10/08/1949 55 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 15/11/1949 14/12/1949 30 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 13/02/1950 16/03/1950 32 days Heavy Intermediate  
Crewe Works 03/08/1950 08/09/1950 37 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 06/11/1950 20/12/1950 45 days Heavy Casual  
Crewe Works 02/12/1950 20/01/1951 50 days Non Classified
Rectification work
 
Crewe Works 25/04/1951 28/05/1951 34 days Light Intermediate  
Crewe Works 26/07/1951 29/08/1951 35 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 15/12/1951 26/04/1952 134 days Heavy General
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Crewe Works 06/02/1953 10/03/1953 33 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 16/10/1953 17/11/1953 33 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 16/07/1954 17/09/1954 64 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 27/09/1954 01/10/1954 5 days Non Classified
Rectification work
 
Crewe Works 28/03/1956 19/05/1956 53 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 05/06/1956 08/06/1956 4 days Non Classified
Rectification work
 
Crewe Works 18/07/1956 03/08/1956 17 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 01/01/1957 02/02/1957 33 days Heavy Casual  
Crewe Works 06/05/1957 11/06/1957 37 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 02/10/1957 05/10/1957 4 days Non Classified
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Crewe Works 19/11/1957 11/01/1958 54 days Light Intermediate  
Crewe Works 06/10/1958 23/12/1958 79 days Heavy Intermediate  
Crewe Works 30/12/1958 01/01/1959 3 days Non Classified
Rectification work
 
Crewe Works 17/04/1959 14/05/1959 28 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 18/02/1960 04/06/1960 108 days Heavy General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/11/1933 To Service To service as LMS Number 6201, name: PRINCESS ELIZABETH
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number
Allocated to Camden (W1)
Livery applied: LMS lined red
Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted
   
06/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (27A)    
16/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 16/03/1934. Dep: 29/03/1934.    
01/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 01/05/1934. Dep: 15/05/1934.    
24/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 24/07/1934. Dep: 02/08/1934.    
11/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 11/12/1934. Dep: 21/12/1934.    
12/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 12/03/1935. Dep: 28/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 9066 (LMS 9t Riveted) attached.
   
10/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/10/1935. Dep: 03/12/1935.    
10/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 10/01/1936. Dep: 31/01/1936.    
13/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 13/04/1936. Dep: 23/04/1936.    
20/06/1936 Tender Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted number 9065    
24/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 07/11/1936.    
28/11/1936 Tender Tender fitted: LMS 10t Riveted number 9373    
04/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 29/10/1937.    
10/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 10/07/1938. Dep: 15/08/1938.    
13/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 29/05/1939.    
24/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
15/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
21/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 21/08/1939. Dep: 02/09/1939.    
16/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
21/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
07/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/02/1940. Dep: 19/03/1940.    
07/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 07/05/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940.    
20/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 20/09/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940.    
05/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
04/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 04/06/1941. Dep: 25/06/1941.    
26/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 26/02/1942. Dep: 30/04/1942.    
05/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 05/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942.    
04/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 04/02/1943. Dep: 18/03/1943.    
28/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 28/10/1943. Dep: 31/12/1943.    
21/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 21/04/1944. Dep: 27/04/1944.    
20/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
13/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 13/06/1944. Dep: 28/07/1944.    
28/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 28/12/1944. Dep: 08/02/1945.    
24/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
31/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/10/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945.    
14/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 14/12/1945. Dep: 01/01/1946.    
27/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 27/06/1946. Dep: 07/08/1946.    
17/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 17/09/1946. Dep: 05/12/1946.    
14/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 15/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Painted
   
04/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 04/10/1947. Dep: 22/10/1947.    
02/1948 Livery Change of livery to    
10/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 10/02/1948. Dep: 08/03/1948.    
26/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 26/06/1948. Dep: 03/08/1948.    
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46201    
23/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 16/12/1948.    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
17/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/06/1949. Dep: 10/08/1949.    
15/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1949. Dep: 14/12/1949.    
13/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/02/1950. Dep: 16/03/1950.    
03/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/08/1950. Dep: 08/09/1950.    
06/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1950. Dep: 20/12/1950.    
02/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 02/12/1950. Dep: 20/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Rectification work
   
25/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/04/1951. Dep: 28/05/1951.    
26/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/07/1951. Dep: 29/08/1951.    
15/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/12/1951. Dep: 26/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
06/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1953. Dep: 10/03/1953.    
13/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
16/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1953. Dep: 17/11/1953.    
16/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/07/1954. Dep: 17/09/1954.    
27/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 01/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Rectification work
   
28/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/03/1956. Dep: 19/05/1956.    
05/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 05/06/1956. Dep: 08/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rectification work
   
18/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/07/1956. Dep: 03/08/1956.    
01/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/01/1957. Dep: 02/02/1957.    
06/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/05/1957. Dep: 11/06/1957.    
02/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 02/10/1957. Dep: 05/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
19/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/11/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958.    
05/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
06/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/10/1958. Dep: 23/12/1958.    
30/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 30/12/1958. Dep: 01/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Rectification work
   
17/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/04/1959. Dep: 14/05/1959.    
18/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 18/02/1960. Dep: 04/06/1960.    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
20/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 46201 from Carlisle Upperby (12B)    

prev prev