Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 140 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 140 Week
» 14397 Month
» 242281 Year
» 1463846 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4547 m/e 12/1914

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 45xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 201
Works Number 2604
To Service During 12/1914
Withdrawal Mon 08/02/1960
Scrapping During 05/1960 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 45 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1914
83G Penzance 8w/e 26/03/1955
83E St Blazey 4w/e 04/10/1958
   Withdrawn 08/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 04/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. SLS/194604

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1914 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4547
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2604
   
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
06/1957 Report Report: A report that ex-Taff Vale 0-6-2 tank No. 361 had been installed at Newton Abbot as a stationary boiler is claimed as an error by another reader; the engine did in fact go to Newton Abbot, he writes, but for the reason that her boiler was to be transferred there to 2-6-2 tank No. 4547, which was in need of a new one. No. 4547, incidentally, is unusual in that it has never seen black livery ; it was still G.W. green when overhauled and is now in the new green livery. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
08/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 4547    

prev prev