Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 584 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4132 Week
» 5022 Month
» 313003 Year
» 1197384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4549 m/e 05/1915

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 45xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1915
Withdrawal During 12/1961
Scrapping During 04/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 46 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83D Laira 4w/e 27/02/1960
83G Penzance 4w/e 18/06/1960
83F Truro 4w/e 10/09/1960
83G Penzance 4w/e 17/06/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1915 To Service To service as GWR Number 4549
Built at Swindon Works
   
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (83F)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 4549    
04/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev