Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 808 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18611 Week
» 71627 Month
» 191154 Year
» 3218007 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4680 |
on |
30/06/1944 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
352 |
To Service |
Fri 30/06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 31/12/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
OXF |
Oxford |
4w/e |
16/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
81B |
Slough |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
85A |
Worcester |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
7w/e |
16/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/05/1963 |
Wolverhampton (Stafford Road) Works (In Works) |
In Works1424, 3607(84G), 3763, 4132/55, 4278, 4646/80, 5263, 5938/75, 6690(88J), 6900/04/16/60/88, 7210, 9790/4. Waiting Works: L92 (ex-5786), 2896, 4255, 6648. Ex Works: 8400, 6134. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4680 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
31/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4680 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|