Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 135 Today
» 1178 Yesterday
» 3458 Week
» 17715 Month
» 245599 Year
» 1467164 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4909 m/e 01/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/1929 BLAKESLEY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 254
To Service During 01/1929
Withdrawal During 09/1962
Scrapping During 04/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 33 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1929
82C Swindon 3w/e 19/05/1951
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 25/11/1953
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 28/01/1956
82D Westbury 4w/e 30/11/1957
83C Exeter 4w/e 04/11/1961
82C Swindon 4w/e 24/03/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC OXY Oxley 4w/e 23/04/1949
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 24/03/1962
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1943 Sheds noted 1/43 2870 ABDR; 8710, 9797 ABG; 3821, 4909, 6835/9, 7800/11 (BAN); 2220, 5025/76, 5564, 6014/7/24, 7802 (BL); 6863 BL/SPM; 4094, 5049, 5970, 6353 (CDF); 5951, 7815 (GLO); 3446, 5060, 6000, 6911 (LA); 6857 (LDR); 5028 (NA); 2636 (NPT); 9317 (OXF); 8302 (OXY); 2881, 4037/89, 4900/98, 5027, 5922/41/96(); 6155, 6902/20, 9306/8 (PDN); 5975 (PPR); 9315 (RDG); 4956, 5566, 6387, 7253 (SDN); 5994 (SLP); 2838/62, 6873 (STJ); 4013/53, 5031, 5957, 6321 (SRD); 5346 (TYS); 5954/99 (TN); 4045, 5406 (WES); 5983, 6877, 6921 (WOS). SLS/194302
31/01/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. SLS/194604
30/04/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1422/53, 2053, 2230/33, 2414, 2805/10/25, 2915/30/34/35, 3421, 3610, 3709, 3824/48/58, 4017/19/50/89/92/99, 4248/57, 4500/24/50/74/75, 4706, 4906/09/37/63/64, 5037,91/95, 5314, 5900/06124/30/41/60/64/81, 6009/21/26, 6119/24/34/51/62/68, 6313/56/72/98, 6806/63, 6918, 7003, 7321, W.D. 77000, 78607, 79283/288. W.D. No. 77060/145/280/335, 78624 an 79244 have had their tenders removed and were taken to the stock shed on 25/3, where they are now stored. Works' pilots have been: Nos. 198, 1713/53, 2781 an 15102 PDN. New Work 30/4: 15102 PDN (being run in as Works' pilot); 6990; 9662 NPT, 9663 TN, 9664 NPT, 9665, 9666 NEA; 7008 being nearly complete. Engines condemned during April included: Nos. 302 an 3408 SLS/194806
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1929 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4909, name: BLAKESLEY HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4909    

prev prev