Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 141 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 11090 Month
» 238974 Year
» 1460539 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4941 m/e 07/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1929 LLANGEDWYN HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 254
To Service During 07/1929
Withdrawal Mon 22/10/1962
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1929
66 Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/11/1945
NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 20/04/1946
81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 17/05/1952
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 05/09/1953
87F Llanelly 4w/e 14/08/1954
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 19/04/1958
82D Westbury 4w/e 07/10/1961
   Withdrawn 22/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/11/1945
ALLOC NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 20/04/1946
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   22/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. SLS/194805
30/04/1949 Swindon Works New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning.
Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902.
SLS/194906
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1929 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4941, name: LLANGEDWYN HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (66)    
20/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT )    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
22/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4941    

prev prev