|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering works during April included:- 2095, 2159, 2407, 2612, 2655, 2702, 2784, 2787, 2808, 2835, 2936, 2937, 2940, 2949, 2954, 2989, 3012, 3018, 3048, 3150, 3386, 3586, 3594, 4007, 4020, 4023, 4042, 4078, 4381, 4920, 4968, 4971, 5012, 5043, 5305, 5375, 5960, 5986, 6023, 6309, 6344, 6399, 6953, 6970, and L.M.S. 8465. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are 3663, 8713, and 8794. Works' pilots during April included: 200, 207, 1542, 1795, 1796, 2723, 2773 and 3561. New engines reported are: 1029 PDN, 9404 PDN. | SLS/194706 |
21/10/1948 | Swindon Stock Shed | On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1929 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4968, name: SHOTTON HALL Built at Swindon Works |
||
11/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (PZ) | ||
05/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3900 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) | ||
03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4968 | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
02/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (83G) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
29/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (83G) | ||
31/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) | ||
22/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
13/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4968 | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |