Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1394 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19197 Week
» 72213 Month
» 191740 Year
» 3218593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4980 |
m/e |
02/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
Hall |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
254 |
To Service |
During 02/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 04/07/1963 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4980, name: WROTTESLEY HALL Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Penzance (PZ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
04/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4980 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|