|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 28/01/1929 | 30/03/1929 | 62 days | Heavy | Tender number 2414 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
117236 | |
Swindon Works | 23/04/1930 | 16/06/1930 | 55 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 29/01/1931 | 01/04/1931 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 4658 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2541 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
216414 | |
Swindon Works | 25/08/1932 | 15/10/1932 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2618 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
311747 | |
Swindon Works | 03/01/1934 | 24/02/1934 | 53 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2602 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
405199 | |
Swindon Works | 25/09/1934 | 30/10/1934 | 36 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2618 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
447301 | |
Swindon Works | 24/04/1935 | 27/06/1935 | 65 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2448 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
485044 | |
Swindon Works | 08/09/1936 | 19/10/1936 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA) |
563517 | |
Swindon Works | 27/05/1937 | 11/06/1937 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 29/10/1937 | 25/11/1937 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 26/02/1938 | 05/05/1938 | 69 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2689 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
645343 | |
Swindon Works | 14/11/1938 | 20/12/1938 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 15/01/1940 | 15/03/1940 | 61 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
750620 | |
Swindon Works | 29/10/1940 | 04/12/1940 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 16/06/1941 | 04/09/1941 | 81 days | General | Boiler number 6608 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
827300 | |
Swindon Works | 24/03/1943 | 09/05/1943 | 47 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2626 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
907873 | |
Swindon Works | 18/04/1944 | 25/05/1944 | 38 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 17/03/1945 | 23/05/1945 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 4656 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1011015 | |
Swindon Works | 04/05/1946 | 02/07/1946 | 60 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 12/05/1947 | 18/06/1947 | 38 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB) |
1102613 | |
Swindon Works | 13/10/1948 | 16/11/1948 | 35 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6678 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2807 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1169058 | |
Swindon Works | 07/06/1950 | 26/07/1950 | 50 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4041 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1259658 | |
Swindon Works | 11/02/1952 | 12/03/1952 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6616 (Diagram HB) |
1355855 | |
Swindon Works | 27/10/1953 | 01/12/1953 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4640 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4058 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1452244 | |
Swindon Works | 14/02/1955 | 29/03/1955 | 44 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6646 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2631 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1524146 | |
Swindon Works | 17/12/1956 | 18/02/1957 | 64 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1614299 | |
Swindon Works | 06/05/1957 | 25/06/1957 | 51 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2648 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/08/1958 | 21/10/1958 | 71 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6677 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2703 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1691897 | |
Swindon Works | 09/05/1960 | 05/08/1960 | 89 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7605 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4085 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1766556 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. | SLS/194708 |
31/10/1948 | Swindon Works | New work October: Nos. 7438 DG (4/10), 7439 LLY (12/10); 4165 TYS (7/10), 4166 (15/10), 4167 (22/10), whilst under construction were:-Nos. *4168/69, 6760-69 (6760/61 were almost complete on 27/10). These will be followed by Nos. 6991-99 and 7900 under Lot 368. *It is understood that Nos. 4170-79 will not be built at present. Locomotives entering Works October: These included Nos. 259 (condemned)-this is the last Barry Rly. Class 'B' to retain the original boiler, 783 (condemned), 1023/26, 1362, 1745 (condemned), 2166-this is the last of .the class to retain a boiler with a round-topped firebox. The boiler also carries a rather unusual type of safety valve, upon which are mounted the whistles, 2243/52, 2709 (condemned), 2804/48/65, 2928 (condemned), 2989 (condemned), 3005/13/39/46 (all condemned), 3104/87, 3335 (condemned), 3341, 3376 (condemned), 3445 (condemned), 3811/33, 4048, 4118, 4290, 4502/29/83, 4918/32/66/93/96, 5007/38/40/69/81/83/85/91, 5111, 5214/33, 5320/40 (both condemned), 5364/84, 5530/63, 5965/74/92, 6004/09/27, 6116/37/44, 6319/30/53/55/76, 6436, 6817, 6908/22/77, 7000/17, 7215/34, 7300, 9300, 9711/45. Nos. 4160-65 came out in standard G.W. green (unlined) and lettered 'British Railways'; 4166/67 black (fully lined), but not lettered; 7430-38 standard G.W. green (unlined), but not lettered, while No. 7439 came out black, being neither lined nor lettered. The following have been repainted black, fully lined, but not lettered: Nos. 4166/67, 4975, 5955, 6908/16 while Nos. 3826/61, 4128, 4280, 4532, 5183, 5207, 6393 an 7439 are also black, but are neither lined nor lettered. Locomotives fitted with smokebox numberplates during October included:-Nos. 1991, 2144, 2838, 3826/61/64, 4088, 4128/66/67, 4280, 4532, 4639, 4975, 5015, 5183, 5207, 5375, 5951/55, 6340/71/93, 6406, 6908/16, 7439, 7730, 7818, 9730. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77026, 77200 an 79239 have been noted ex repair, by Armstrong Whitworth's; they were painted black and had large Gill Sans numerals. After acting as Works' pilots, Nos. 1730 an 2755 have now been finally withdrawn. |
SLS/194812 |
31/07/1962 | Withdrawn GWR engines | It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1927 | Tender | Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2100 | ||
30/06/1927 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5007, name: ROUGEMONT CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (LA) Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
28/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/01/1929. Dep: 30/03/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 2414 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1930. Dep: 16/06/1930. | ||
29/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1931. Dep: 01/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4658 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2541 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1932. Dep: 15/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2618 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/10/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
03/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/01/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934. Work undertaken: Tender number 2602 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/09/1934. Dep: 30/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2618 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/03/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
24/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1935. Dep: 27/06/1935. Work undertaken: Tender number 2448 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/06/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
08/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1936. Dep: 19/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA) |
||
27/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1937. Dep: 11/06/1937. | ||
29/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1937. Dep: 25/11/1937. | ||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 05/05/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2689 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
14/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/11/1938. Dep: 20/12/1938. | ||
15/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 15/01/1940. Dep: 15/03/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
30/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
29/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1940. Dep: 04/12/1940. | ||
16/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1941. Dep: 04/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6608 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/03/1943. Dep: 09/05/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2626 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/04/1944. Dep: 25/05/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 23/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4656 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 02/07/1946. | ||
13/01/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2701 | ||
12/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/05/1947. Dep: 18/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB) |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
14/04/1948 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2687 | ||
13/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1948. Dep: 16/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6678 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2807 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/06/1950. Dep: 26/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4041 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/02/1952. Dep: 12/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6616 (Diagram HB) |
||
27/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/10/1953. Dep: 01/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4640 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4058 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/02/1955. Dep: 29/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6646 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2631 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/12/1956. Dep: 18/02/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
06/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/05/1957. Dep: 25/06/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 2648 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/08/1958. Dep: 21/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6677 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2703 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (82C) | ||
09/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/05/1960. Dep: 05/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7605 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4085 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/03/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
05/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5007 from Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |