Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 538 Today
» 1100 Yesterday
» 5794 Week
» 24377 Month
» 221894 Year
» 298481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5028   26/05/1934

Names Carried
Date From Name
26/05/1934 LLANTILIO CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 26/05/1934 to Laira (LA)
Withdrawal Fri 20/05/1960 off Laira (83D)
Scrapping During 06/1960 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 25 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2641 05/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2654 31/03/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2579 20/12/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2796 20/09/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2693 10/02/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2674 14/02/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2714 17/09/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2794 27/01/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2552 14/03/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2401 16/10/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2557 29/01/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2425 22/07/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4032 19/05/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4062 01/06/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4005 07/04/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2848 26/01/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2727 03/10/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2731 20/03/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2583 22/03/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4105 13/01/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LA Laira (New) 26/05/1934
NA Newton Abbot 03/01/1938
TR Truro 06/1938
NA Newton Abbot 10/1938
83D Laira 06/1956
   Withdrawn 20/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 16/06/1956
WDN   20/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/05/1934 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6615)
20/12/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6616)
10/02/1941 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6637)
14/03/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4635)
16/10/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6658)
22/07/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4638)
01/06/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6625)
07/04/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6673)
26/01/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6601)
03/06/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6612)
13/01/1959 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6643)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 21/09/1935 28/09/1935 8 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 18/02/1936 07/04/1936 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
125488
Swindon Works 05/11/1937 03/01/1938 60 days General
Boiler number 6616 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
234935
Swindon Works 10/08/1939 25/09/1939 47 days Intermediate
Tender number 2796 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
335228
Swindon Works 14/12/1940 13/02/1941 62 days Light Repair
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2693 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
402209
Swindon Works 27/12/1941 17/02/1942 53 days Intermediate
Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
454835
Swindon Works 21/07/1943 21/09/1943 63 days Light Repair
Tender number 2714 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 01/02/1945 14/03/1945 42 days General
Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2552 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
587498
Swindon Works 08/09/1947 16/10/1947 39 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2401 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
689489
Swindon Works 02/06/1949 22/07/1949 51 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4638 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2425 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
769465
Swindon Works 27/04/1951 01/06/1951 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4032 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
852513
Swindon Works 23/02/1953 07/04/1953 44 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6673 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
957133
Swindon Works 20/12/1954 26/01/1955 38 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6601 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2848 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1063951
Swindon Works 06/02/1957 03/06/1957 118 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB)
1177333
Swindon Works 28/11/1958 13/01/1959 47 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4105 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1282680

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1934 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2641    
26/05/1934 To Service To service as GWR Number 5028, name: LLANTILIO CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (LA)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
21/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 28/09/1935.    
18/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/02/1936. Dep: 07/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1937. Dep: 03/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6616 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
06/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (TR)    
10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
10/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/08/1939. Dep: 25/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2796 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 13/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2693 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/12/1941. Dep: 17/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/07/1943. Dep: 21/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2714 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/01/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2794    
01/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1945. Dep: 14/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2552 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/09/1947. Dep: 16/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2401 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/01/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2557    
02/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/06/1949. Dep: 22/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4638 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2425 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/04/1951. Dep: 01/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4032 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
23/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 07/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6673 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
20/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 20/12/1954. Dep: 26/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6601 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2848 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
06/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1957. Dep: 03/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB)
   
03/10/1957 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2727    
20/03/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2731    
22/03/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2583    
28/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/11/1958. Dep: 13/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4105 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
20/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 5028 from Laira (83D)    
06/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev