Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 112 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 7296 Month
» 315277 Year
» 1199658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5067   21/07/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
21/07/1937 ST FAGANS CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 21/07/1937 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Fri 13/07/1962 off Reading (W.R.) (81D)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 24 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2560 10/07/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2616 11/05/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2656 17/07/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2530 30/01/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2566 16/03/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2401 23/01/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2834 23/06/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2845 05/07/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2620 30/12/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4001 05/06/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2913 18/05/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4058 14/06/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4043 01/02/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2915 17/02/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4006 17/12/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2409 14/11/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2839 20/06/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4034 16/05/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 21/07/1937
SDN Swindon 20/03/1943
BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 01/1948
87G Carmarthen 20/06/1958
81D Reading (W.R.) 10/05/1961
   Withdrawn 13/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/07/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6671)
16/03/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4632)
05/07/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6608)
30/12/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6630)
05/06/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6684)
17/02/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6627)
14/11/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6635)
16/05/1960 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6617)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 13/11/1937 21/11/1937 9 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 27/03/1939 17/05/1939 52 days Intermediate
Tender number 2616 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
132227
Swindon Works 15/05/1941 25/07/1941 72 days Intermediate
Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
248488
Swindon Works 29/01/1943 20/03/1943 51 days General
Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2530 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
333268
Swindon Works 10/05/1945 23/06/1945 45 days Intermediate
Tender number 2834 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
423595
Swindon Works 10/06/1947 05/07/1947 26 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6608 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2845 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
514261
Swindon Works 26/11/1948 30/12/1948 35 days General
Boiler number 6630 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
579939
Swindon Works 27/04/1950 05/06/1950 40 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 6684 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4001 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
636092
Swindon Works 13/04/1951 18/05/1951 36 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2913 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
683473
Swindon Works 01/06/1951 14/06/1951 14 days Unclassified
Tender number 4058 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 17/01/1952 01/05/1952 106 days Unclassified
Tender number 4043 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 05/01/1953 17/02/1953 44 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6627 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2915 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
770263
Swindon Works 01/11/1954 17/12/1954 47 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
868085
Swindon Works 06/08/1956 14/11/1956 101 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6635 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2409 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
944591
Swindon Works 01/05/1958 20/06/1958 51 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2839 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1031885
Swindon Works 25/02/1960 16/05/1960 82 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4034 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1119076

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/07/1937 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2560    
21/07/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 5067, name: ST FAGANS CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
13/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1937. Dep: 21/11/1937.    
27/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/03/1939. Dep: 17/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2616 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 15/05/1941. Dep: 25/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2530 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
23/01/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2401    
10/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2834 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/06/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6608 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2845 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
26/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1948. Dep: 30/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6630 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1950. Dep: 05/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6684 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4001 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
13/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/04/1951. Dep: 18/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2913 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1951. Dep: 14/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4058 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1952. Dep: 01/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4043 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
05/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 05/01/1953. Dep: 17/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6627 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2915 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/11/1954. Dep: 17/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
06/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/08/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6635 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2409 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/05/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2839 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
25/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/02/1960. Dep: 16/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4034 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
10/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
13/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5067 from Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev