Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 113 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17916 Week
» 70932 Month
» 190459 Year
» 3217312 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5163 |
on |
08/12/1930 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84E |
Tyseley |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/12/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5163 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
02/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5163 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|