Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 177 Today
» 977 Yesterday
» 4173 Week
» 11357 Month
» 319338 Year
» 1203719 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5188 m/e 04/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal During 07/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84A Stafford Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 16/07/1955
84A Stafford Road 4w/e 08/10/1955
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 10/08/1957
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 22/03/1958
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/11/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 05/10/1946
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as GWR Number 5188
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5188    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev