Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 122 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4937 Week
» 11071 Month
» 238955 Year
» 1460520 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5190 m/e 10/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 284
To Service During 10/1934
Withdrawal During 09/1962
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1934
84A Stafford Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 16/05/1953
81F Oxford 4w/e 28/01/1956
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 28/01/1961
83C Exeter 4w/e 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 82E Yeovil Pen Mill 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 14/07/1962
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1934 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5190
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5190    

prev prev