Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 342 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4080 Week
» 1593 Month
» 229477 Year
» 1451042 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5231 m/e 06/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 225
To Service During 06/1924
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 39 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1924
86F Aberbeeg 4w/e 19/05/1962
88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LTS Llantrisant m/e 31/05/1948
ALLOC PILL Newport Pill 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 86F Aberbeeg 4w/e 19/05/1962
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1924 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5231
Built at Swindon Works
   
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86F)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5231    

prev prev