|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1945 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during October, 1945: 2184, 2206, 2530/41, 2638, 2805/14/72/3/82/8, 2915/33/46, 3025/36, 3656, 3810/3/66, 4016/7/32/40/4154/618/96, 4517/51/64/80, 4603/17/41/53/65, 4704, 4818/31/6, 4925/9/47, 5065/84, 5208/37, 5312/56/81, 5422, 5508/22/66/72, 5718/23, 5902/21/4/8/9/64 6000/6/9/24, 6116, 6378/9, 6437, 6732/9, 6955, 7214, 7719/26/40, 8741/6, 9304/17, 9702/64. L.M.S. 8402/6/14. L.N.E. K3 17. | SLS/194602 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1917 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5312 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2684 |
||
01/01/1934 | Allocation | |||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) | ||
30/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
24/04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
22/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (84B) | ||
24/10/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5312 |