Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2264 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15670 Week
» 68686 Month
» 188213 Year
» 3215066 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
5316 |
m/e |
07/1917 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
206 |
Works Number |
2688 |
To Service |
During 07/1917 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 21/06/1956 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,140,270 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5316 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2688 |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) |
|
|
21/06/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5316 |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|