|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during February included:- Nos. 1013-15 1943, 1995, 2903, 2933, 2945, 2955, 3004, 3816, 3863, 4020, 4043, 4079, 4098, 4904, 4939, 4944, 4956, 5018, 5035, 5053, 5062, 5090, 5324, 5337, 5381, 5927, 5953, 5982, 6015, 6020, 6025, 6366, 6866, 6934, 6956, 7002, 7212, 7214, 7300, W.D. 77027, 77184, 79279, 79301 an 79309. Further locomotives ex works with prefix W and plain tanks or tenders included Nos. 823, 1433, 1441, 2288, 2951, while No. 6000 has the prefix and 'British Railways' on the tender | SLS/194804 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1917 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5324 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2696 |
||
01/01/1934 | Allocation | |||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Banbury (BAN) | ||
03/1948 | Modification | Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
25/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neyland (87H) | ||
01/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
18/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
16/09/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5324 |