Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1428 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19231 Week
» 72247 Month
» 191774 Year
» 3218627 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
5328 |
m/e |
09/1917 |
Great Western Railway (1st Renum) |
8328 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
Great Western Railway (2nd Renum) |
5328 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
206 |
Works Number |
2700 |
To Service |
During 09/1917 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 29/07/1958 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1935 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5328 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2700 |
|
|
01/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8328 |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
09/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
06/1944 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5328 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (WEY) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
25/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
29/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5328 |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|