Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1030 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8490 Week
» 6003 Month
» 233887 Year
» 1455452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5565 m/e 01/1929

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 4575
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 253
To Service During 01/1929
Withdrawal During 09/1960
Scrapping During 01/1961 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 31 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1929
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 21/02/1953
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 04/10/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 04/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. SLS/194604
31/05/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. 1903, 2031, 2808/89, 2924/36/37/54, 3827, 4021/22/32/51/80/89/91/96, 4386, 4938/40/92, 5010/21/23, 5158, 5258, 5317/36/74, 5526/48/59/65, 5914/68, 6001/11/25/29, 6369/89, 6426, 6807/71, 6900/06/27/29, 7007, 7301/15, 77028, 77429 an 78714. New work (May): Nos. 7008 OXF, 7009 LDR (the latter is fitted with smokebox number plate); D.E. 15103/04 PDN; 9667-70. No. 7010 is nearly ready (28/5) and is painted pea green, as also is No. 4089, which is undergoing a general repair. Nos. 6009/26 have been painted royal blue and lined out in grey, yellow and red. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 1713, 2730/49/81, 3561 and D.E. 15103/04. Locomotives condemned include: Nos. 3391, 2980 an 2988. SLS/194807

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1929 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5565
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 5565    

prev prev