Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 854 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4402 Week
» 5292 Month
» 313273 Year
» 1197654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5666 m/e 06/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1926
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 37 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88D Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1951
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/03/1952
88D Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 17/05/1952
88D Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1952
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC MD   4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1926 To Service To service as GWR Number 5666
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
09/08/1954 Sightings Barry Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5666    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev