Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 35 Online
» 2371 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15777 Week
» 68793 Month
» 188320 Year
» 3215173 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5704 |
m/e |
01/1929 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
87C |
Danygraig |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
ALLOC |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5704 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23822 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea East Dock (SED) |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
23/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5704 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|