Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1560 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14966 Week
» 67982 Month
» 187509 Year
» 3214362 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5722 |
m/e |
03/1929 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LDR |
Landore |
4w/e |
28/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
LLY |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
27/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
15/07/1950 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5722 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23840 |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (LLY) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Llanelli (LLY) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
31/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
29/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
22/09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5722 |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|