Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 168 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17971 Week
» 70987 Month
» 190514 Year
» 3217367 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5725 |
m/e |
01/1929 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1929 |
OXY |
|
Oxley |
4w/e |
14/12/1935 |
CHR |
|
Chester West |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
09/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/09/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5725 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23843 |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Chester West (CHR) |
|
|
09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5725 |
|
|
10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|