Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1890 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15296 Week
» 68312 Month
» 187839 Year
» 3214692 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5734 |
m/e |
03/1929 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1929 |
DYD |
|
Duffryn Yard |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
86B |
|
Newport Pill |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/05/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
86B |
Newport Pill |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5734 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23852 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
25/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5734 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|