Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 125 Today
» 1178 Yesterday
» 3448 Week
» 17705 Month
» 245589 Year
» 1467154 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5975 m/e 05/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1937 WINSLOW HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 304
To Service During 05/1937
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 27 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1937
82D Westbury 4w/e 31/12/1950
82C Swindon 4w/e 31/10/1953
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 01/12/1956
82D Westbury 8w/e 20/04/1957
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 13/08/1960
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 10/09/1960
82E Bristol Barrow Road 7w/e 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   3w/e 10/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1943 Sheds noted 1/43 2870 ABDR; 8710, 9797 ABG; 3821, 4909, 6835/9, 7800/11 (BAN); 2220, 5025/76, 5564, 6014/7/24, 7802 (BL); 6863 BL/SPM; 4094, 5049, 5970, 6353 (CDF); 5951, 7815 (GLO); 3446, 5060, 6000, 6911 (LA); 6857 (LDR); 5028 (NA); 2636 (NPT); 9317 (OXF); 8302 (OXY); 2881, 4037/89, 4900/98, 5027, 5922/41/96(); 6155, 6902/20, 9306/8 (PDN); 5975 (PPR); 9315 (RDG); 4956, 5566, 6387, 7253 (SDN); 5994 (SLP); 2838/62, 6873 (STJ); 4013/53, 5031, 5957, 6321 (SRD); 5346 (TYS); 5954/99 (TN); 4045, 5406 (WES); 5983, 6877, 6921 (WOS). SLS/194302
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907
17/09/1961 Swindon Works (Triangle) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111
18/05/1963 Wolverhampton (Stafford Road) Works (In Works) In Works1424, 3607(84G), 3763, 4132/55, 4278, 4646/80, 5263, 5938/75, 6690(88J), 6900/04/16/60/88, 7210, 9790/4. Waiting Works: L92 (ex-5786), 2896, 4255, 6648. Ex Works: 8400, 6134. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1937 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5975, name: WINSLOW HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5975    

prev prev