Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 303 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4041 Week
» 1554 Month
» 229438 Year
» 1451003 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5976 m/e 09/1938
GWR (Oil Burner) 3951 m/e 30/04/1947
GWR (Ex-Oil) 5976 on 23/11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1938 ASHWICKE HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 311
To Service During 09/1938
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 25 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1938
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 24/01/1959
87F Llanelly 4w/e 14/07/1962
87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 29/06/1963
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 19/04/1947
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 17/05/1947
ALLOC EXE Exeter 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 29/09/1963
WDN   w/e 22/06/1964
ALLOC 82C Swindon 3w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1948 Oil burning equipment removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1948 Swindon Works New Work November: Nos. 6761 DYD (3/11), 6762 (4/11), 6763 (10/11), 6764 (12/11), 6765 (26/11); 4169 (15/11); 6991 Acton Burnell Hall WES (22/11), 6992 Arborfield Hall (26/11); Nos. 4168 an 6760 PILL were both completed on 29/10. Locomotives entering Works 28/10/48 to 26/11/48: These included Nos. 184 (condemned), 1013/27, 1331, 1435, 1538 (condemned - at present being used as Works pilot), 1749 (condemned), *1867 (condemned), *2010, *2121, *2187, 2249, *2706, *2717 (both condemned), 2819/71/74/88/96, 2906/32/40/43/53, 3169/86, 3624/77, 3733, 3806/41/64, 3951, 4015/18/25/60/81/83/92/93, 4123, 4287, 4508/53/84, 4665/91, 4900/60, 5031/32/49/67, 5121 (condemned), 5128/77, 5345, 5406/11, 5537/44/48, 5689, 5744/72/81/94, 5801, 5926/67/89, 6021, 6146, 6382/88, 6407, 6715, 6835/43/52, 6915/35/40/47/50/59/61, 7760, 7808, 8751, **9019 (condemned), 9310, 9754, 'Austerity' 77380. *Open cab. **Fitted small 2,000 gallon tender (No. 1128 of 4/96). Nos. 6991/92 came out painted black and fully lined, While Nos. 4168/69, 6760/65 are black and unlined. The following have been painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 4966/96, 5967/92, 6922/40/50 while Nos. 1362, 2194, 2252, 2840, 3685/96, 3811, 4290, 5214, 5384, 5563, 7234, 7716/64, 8768/77, 9310 an 9711 are painted black, but not lined. Nos. 3720 an 7702 have 'G.W.R.' on the tank sides and are fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 6009 has been fitted with a new standard cast iron smokebox num-berplate, in place of the former smaller brass one, all locomotives leaving Works are now fitted with smokebox numberplates. Locomotives noted with top feed boilers:-Nos. 3624/85/96, 5772/81, 5801, 7702/16/64, 8710/68/77, 9745. SLS/194901
12/11/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1938 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5976, name: ASHWICKE HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/04/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3951    
11/1948 Modification Modification: Oil burning equipment removed    
23/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 5976    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5976    

prev prev