|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1950 | 02/06/1950 | 45 days | General | Named MEG MERRILIES |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1951 | 29/05/1951 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1952 | 19/09/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29829 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1954 | 06/02/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29872 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1955 | 06/05/1955 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1956 | 21/09/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1957 | 02/07/1957 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1958 | 06/05/1958 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 10591 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1959 | 15/01/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 10594 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1960 | 20/07/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1960 | 15/10/1960 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1962 | 26/05/1962 | 18 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/09/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60115 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2032 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
19/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1950. Dep: 02/06/1950. Work undertaken: Named MEG MERRILIES |
||
02/06/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
25/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1951. Dep: 29/05/1951. | ||
15/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1952. Dep: 19/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29829 (Diagram 118) |
||
19/09/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
05/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29872 (Diagram 118) |
||
30/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1955. Dep: 06/05/1955. | ||
09/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1956. Dep: 21/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
02/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/07/1957. Dep: 02/07/1957. | ||
26/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1958. Dep: 06/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10591 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1959. Dep: 15/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10594 (Diagram 118) |
||
18/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/07/1960. Dep: 20/07/1960. | ||
16/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960. | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
09/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1962. Dep: 26/05/1962. | ||
12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60115 from Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) |