|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1950 | 22/03/1950 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1950 | 17/10/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1951 | 01/05/1951 | 28 days | Heavy Intermediate | Named HAL O' THE WYND |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1952 | 22/08/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1953 | 20/02/1953 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1954 | 09/03/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29829 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1954 | 10/08/1954 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/10/1954 | 20/10/1954 | 6 days | Light Casual | Smokebox tube plate welded |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1955 | 24/08/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29861 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1956 | 09/11/1956 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1957 | 22/02/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29810 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1957 | 14/11/1957 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1958 | 19/09/1958 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29864 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1958 | 02/10/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1959 | 12/01/1960 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29803 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1960 | 17/08/1960 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1960 | 16/12/1960 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1962 | 23/02/1962 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1962 | 02/06/1962 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29786 (Diagram 117) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1951 | \"Heart of Midlothian\" service | A1 No. 60151 Midlothian fitted with new type double chimney worked the inaugural 'Heart of Midlothian' Festival train from King's Cross, with a complete set of new standard coaches. No. 60116, lately named Hal o'the Wynd has also acquired a similar chimney. B17 No. 61653, on the other hand, is 'recently off works with what appears to be a K3 chimney and looks rather odd: it is appearing regularly at the moment on the 'Royal' working, No. 61671 being a casualty yet again. | SLS/195107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/10/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60116 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2033 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
10/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1950. Dep: 22/03/1950. | ||
17/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 17/10/1950. Dep: 17/10/1950. | ||
04/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/04/1951. Dep: 01/05/1951. Work undertaken: Named HAL O' THE WYND |
||
24/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1952. Dep: 22/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/08/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
26/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/01/1953. Dep: 20/02/1953. | ||
28/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1954. Dep: 09/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29829 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/07/1954. Dep: 10/08/1954. | ||
15/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1954. Dep: 20/10/1954. Work undertaken: Smokebox tube plate welded |
||
15/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1955. Dep: 24/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29861 (Diagram 118) |
||
01/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1956. Dep: 09/11/1956. | ||
21/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1957. Dep: 22/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29810 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1957. Dep: 14/11/1957. | ||
06/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1958. Dep: 19/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29864 (Diagram 118) |
||
29/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1958. Dep: 02/10/1958. | ||
04/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1959. Dep: 12/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29803 (Diagram 118) |
||
08/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1960. Dep: 17/08/1960. | ||
25/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1960. Dep: 16/12/1960. | ||
05/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1962. Dep: 23/02/1962. | ||
26/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1962. Dep: 02/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29786 (Diagram 117) |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
18/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60116 from Gateshead (52A) |