|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1950 | 28/07/1950 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1951 | 17/10/1951 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1952 | 05/12/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29808 (Diagram 118) |
||
Gateshead Works | 20/04/1953 | 24/04/1953 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/10/1953 | 04/11/1953 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1954 | 16/03/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29832 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1954 | 01/10/1954 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/04/1955 | 04/05/1955 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1955 | 19/08/1955 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1955 | 30/11/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29820 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1957 | 05/07/1957 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29811 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1958 | 04/06/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1959 | 18/04/1959 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29878 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1959 | 15/10/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1960 | 26/05/1960 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1961 | 06/05/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29882 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1961 | 09/08/1961 | 20 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1950 | A.1 namings | Latest reported nameplates affixed to 'A.1' Class: 60117 Bois Rousell; 60118 Archibald Sturrock; 60119 Patrick Stirling; 60122 Curlew; 60123 H. A. Ivatt; 60126 Sir Vincent Raven; 60130 Kestrel; 60140 Balmoral. | SLS/195010 |
31/01/1954 | York MPD | J77 class 0-6-OT's, normally rare at York, were represented there in January by 68435 (53C) under repair at the north shed towards the end of the month, and 68401 (53B) shunting at Queen Street and later under repair at the south shed. On 1/1/54 65022 (Class J2) was noted 'dead' en route for breaking up at Darlington Works hauled by an 'Austerity' 2-8-0. By contrast new Diesel 13079 from Darlington came up light through York on 19/1/54. Other unusual visitors included 60519 (64B) ex-works on Doncaster turns into York on 16/1/54. One of the Westinghouse fitted Standard Class 5 4-6-0's from Derby, 73031, visited York on 6/1/54. The engine concerned in the derailment of the down 'Heart of Midlothian' at Thirsk on 20/1/54 was 60126 (52B) which was later noted 'dead' in York shed yard. On the evening of the derailment the down 'Aberdonian' and other expresses were diverted from York via Knaresborough, Bilton, and Ripon. 60080 (52B) failed at York on the 7.45 a.m. Newcastle-King's Cross express (non-stop from Darlington to Peterborough) on 25/1/54 and was replaced by the York south end pilot 60502 (50A) which went forward 34 minutes late. 60539 (52B) took over this working on the next day. |
SLS/195403 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/04/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60126 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2042 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
07/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1950. Dep: 28/07/1950. | ||
08/1950 | Naming | Named 'SIR VINCENT RAVEN' | ||
07/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/09/1951. Dep: 17/10/1951. | ||
05/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1952. Dep: 05/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29808 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 24/04/1953. | ||
27/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/10/1953. Dep: 04/11/1953. | ||
05/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1954. Dep: 16/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29832 (Diagram 118) |
||
01/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1954. Dep: 01/10/1954. | ||
28/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1955. Dep: 04/05/1955. | ||
12/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/08/1955. Dep: 19/08/1955. | ||
27/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1955. Dep: 30/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29820 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1957. Dep: 05/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29811 (Diagram 118) |
||
27/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1958. Dep: 04/06/1958. | ||
07/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29878 (Diagram 118) |
||
06/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1959. Dep: 15/10/1959. | ||
22/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1960. Dep: 26/05/1960. | ||
28/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29882 (Diagram 118) |
||
21/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1961. Dep: 09/08/1961. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
18/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60126 from York (North) (50A) |