|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1949 | 19/05/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1950 | 13/09/1950 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 10636 (Diagram 118) Named WILSON WORSDELL |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1952 | 26/03/1952 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/11/1952 | 20/11/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1953 | 31/01/1953 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1953 | 06/01/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29819 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1954 | 22/03/1954 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1955 | 22/08/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29810 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1956 | 19/01/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29864 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1958 | 01/07/1958 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29782 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1959 | 16/10/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 10636 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1961 | 25/11/1961 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29789 (Diagram 117) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1963 | 07/10/1963 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
31/08/1950 | General | Two N.E. Region engines recently named are 60127 Wilson Worsdell and 60153 Flamboyant of Heaton and York respectively. Owing to the scarcity of pull-and-push engines at King's Cross, the Alexandra Palace branch has been worked occasionally by 'N.2' tanks, Which run round the train. One of these, numbered 69540 on the bunker, had the former number 9540 visible on the tanks. A fitted 'N.7' from Neasden has also been assisting, as only one of the 'F.2' 2-4-2T (E.7111) now remains and is in poor shape. This engine, originally M.S. & L. No. 783, built by Beyer Peacock in 1896 (No. 3701), class '9G,' is the sole survivor of the G.C. 2-4-2T which once totalled 37 engines. | SLS/195010 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/05/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60127 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2044 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Livery applied: BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
17/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1949. Dep: 19/05/1949. | ||
02/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1950. Dep: 13/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10636 (Diagram 118) Named WILSON WORSDELL |
||
19/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/02/1952. Dep: 26/03/1952. | ||
26/03/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
13/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1952. Dep: 20/11/1952. | ||
22/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1953. Dep: 31/01/1953. | ||
04/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1953. Dep: 06/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29819 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1954. Dep: 22/03/1954. | ||
13/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1955. Dep: 22/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29810 (Diagram 118) |
||
18/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29864 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1958. Dep: 01/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29782 (Diagram 117) |
||
11/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1959. Dep: 16/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10636 (Diagram 118) |
||
18/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1961. Dep: 25/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29789 (Diagram 117) |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
07/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/10/1963. Dep: 07/10/1963. | ||
18/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60127 from Gateshead (52A) |