|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1951 | 01/03/1951 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | Named AULD REEKIE |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/06/1951 | 09/06/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/10/1951 | 13/10/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1953 | 24/03/1953 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1954 | 01/07/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29816 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1957 | 02/08/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29787 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1958 | 09/01/1959 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29817 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1960 | 06/04/1960 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29802 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1961 | 30/12/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29859 (Diagram 118) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/10/1951 | South West Scotland | An unusual visitor at Dumfries on 3rd September, was 60160 Auld Reekie, which left light for Carlisle about 2 p.m. Another interesting engine was ex-GE 0-6-0T, 8562 on loan to Dumfries. Services on the Lockerbie Branch are now only two each way daily (4 on Saturdays) and there is a distinct possibility that passenger services will cease altogether in the near future. Coaling at Beattock is still done by hand, and this is a laborious business. Bunkers are not allowed to get too low if this can be avoided, and after about every second trip up the bank, engines return to the shed for coal. Banking is in the hands of McIntosh 0-4-4Ts and Pickersgill 4-6-2Ts, the latter being less favoured by the men. | SLS/195112 |
21/03/1953 | Eastern Region visitors | Recent visitors include 61153 (39B) on an excursion on (21/3) and 60160 (64B) on (2/4) just ex-works and presumably borrowed by Doncaster while running in. 67785 (34B) has been seen on Hitchin turns lately, together with several Stratford L1s all on loan while the turntable at Hitchin is under repair. | SLS/195306 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60160 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2054 Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
14/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
01/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/02/1951. Dep: 01/03/1951. Work undertaken: Named AULD REEKIE |
||
04/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
16/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
04/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951. | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
12/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951. | ||
22/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
22/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1953. Dep: 24/03/1953. | ||
24/03/1953 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
20/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1954. Dep: 01/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29816 (Diagram 118) |
||
04/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. | ||
01/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 02/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29787 (Diagram 117) |
||
28/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1958. Dep: 09/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29817 (Diagram 118) |
||
23/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1960. Dep: 06/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29802 (Diagram 118) |
||
21/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1961. Dep: 30/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29859 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
12/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60160 from St Margarets (64A) |