|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1928 | 19/10/1928 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1929 | 19/11/1929 | 46 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/09/1930 | 11/11/1930 | 62 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/11/1930 | 13/11/1930 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/11/1930 | 23/12/1930 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/01/1931 | 28/01/1931 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1931 | 03/03/1931 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/05/1931 | 25/05/1931 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/06/1931 | 02/07/1931 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/10/1931 | 24/10/1931 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1932 | 07/06/1932 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 8028 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1932 | 04/10/1932 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1933 | 09/05/1933 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1933 | 14/11/1933 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1934 | 26/06/1934 | 63 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1935 | 12/04/1935 | 36 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1935 | 20/08/1935 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1936 | 30/05/1936 | 53 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/11/1936 | 02/12/1936 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1937 | 04/03/1937 | 50 days | Heavy | Boiler number 8251 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1937 | 26/11/1937 | 38 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1938 | 04/08/1938 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1939 | 22/07/1939 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 8028 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1939 | 18/09/1939 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/05/1940 | 24/05/1940 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/06/1940 | 20/06/1940 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1940 | 25/09/1940 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1941 | 16/02/1942 | 60 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1943 | 09/10/1943 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1945 | 06/04/1945 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8080 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/04/1946 | 23/04/1946 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1946 | 11/10/1946 | 47 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 91 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1948 | 02/04/1948 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 8077 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60091 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 10 days | Unclassified | Painting new colour and inspection by C M E |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/12/1948 | 13/12/1948 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1949 | 14/04/1949 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1949 | 03/11/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9510 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1951 | 03/05/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1952 | 06/01/1953 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27084 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1954 | 25/09/1954 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27017 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1955 | 03/02/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1957 | 23/08/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27010 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1958 | 09/07/1958 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1959 | 14/03/1959 | 55 days | General | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1959 | 22/05/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1960 | 08/10/1960 | 66 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1961 | 13/04/1961 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1961 | 11/10/1961 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 27059 (Diagram 94HP) Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
31/10/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. | SLS/194912 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/09/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2745, name: CAPTAIN CUTTLE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1695 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
10/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/10/1928. Dep: 19/10/1928. | ||
24/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
26/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
05/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 19/11/1929. | ||
30/06/1930 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5480 | ||
11/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1930. Dep: 11/11/1930. | ||
13/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1930. Dep: 13/11/1930. | ||
24/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1930. Dep: 23/12/1930. | ||
13/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1931. Dep: 28/01/1931. | ||
16/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1931. Dep: 03/03/1931. | ||
07/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1931. Dep: 25/05/1931. | ||
16/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1931. Dep: 02/07/1931. | ||
08/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931. | ||
13/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1932. Dep: 07/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8028 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
23/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1932. Dep: 04/10/1932. | ||
16/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1933. Dep: 09/05/1933. | ||
12/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/10/1933. Dep: 14/11/1933. | ||
25/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1934. Dep: 26/06/1934. | ||
08/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/03/1935. Dep: 12/04/1935. | ||
13/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/08/1935. Dep: 20/08/1935. | ||
08/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936. | ||
24/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1936. Dep: 02/12/1936. | ||
14/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/01/1937. Dep: 04/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8251 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
20/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/10/1937. Dep: 26/11/1937. | ||
29/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1938. Dep: 04/08/1938. | ||
31/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8028 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
16/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1939. Dep: 18/09/1939. | ||
22/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1940. Dep: 24/05/1940. | ||
15/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 20/06/1940. | ||
15/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1940. Dep: 25/09/1940. | ||
19/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1941. Dep: 16/02/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
16/02/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
07/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. | ||
22/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1945. Dep: 06/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8080 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 554 but not taken up | ||
23/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1946. Dep: 23/04/1946. | ||
26/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1946. Dep: 11/10/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 91 |
||
04/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1948. Dep: 02/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8077 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60091 |
||
02/04/1948 | Livery | Change of livery to Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining | ||
14/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. Work undertaken: Painting new colour and inspection by C M E |
||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
13/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
06/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1948. Dep: 13/12/1948. | ||
31/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/03/1949. Dep: 14/04/1949. | ||
27/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1949. Dep: 03/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9510 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
04/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1951. Dep: 03/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) |
||
03/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1952. Dep: 06/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27084 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
18/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1954. Dep: 25/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27017 (Diagram 94A) |
||
29/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1955. Dep: 03/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
15/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1957. Dep: 23/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27010 (Diagram 94A) |
||
13/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/06/1958. Dep: 09/07/1958. | ||
06/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
19/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1959. Dep: 14/03/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
08/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1959. Dep: 22/05/1959. | ||
07/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
06/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
04/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1960. Dep: 08/10/1960. | ||
10/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1961. Dep: 13/04/1961. | ||
04/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1961. Dep: 11/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27059 (Diagram 94HP) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
17/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
24/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60091 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |