|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1930 | 12/04/1930 | 40 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1931 | 15/07/1931 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1932 | 18/08/1932 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8076 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1933 | 17/02/1934 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1935 | 23/05/1935 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 8081 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1935 | 31/12/1935 | 30 days | Heavy | Afier Collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1936 | 23/01/1937 | 48 days | General | Tender number 5638 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1937 | 03/03/1937 | 10 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1937 | 28/10/1937 | 32 days | General | Tender number 5580 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1938 | 03/09/1938 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5267 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1939 | 02/12/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1941 | 18/07/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8254 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1942 | 24/02/1943 | 64 days | General | Tender number 5481 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1944 | 19/07/1944 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1944 | 03/10/1944 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1945 | 04/01/1946 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1947 | 01/03/1947 | 45 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1948 | 03/11/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 27068 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60098 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1950 | 28/07/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27082 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1952 | 24/11/1952 | 34 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1954 | 23/01/1954 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 03/08/1954 | 10/08/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1954 | 28/01/1955 | 44 days | General | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 25/07/1955 | 28/07/1955 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1955 | 01/11/1955 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1956 | 18/10/1956 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1958 | 01/04/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27049 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1958 | 19/12/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1959 | 17/07/1959 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27023 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1961 | 25/05/1961 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29304 (Diagram 107) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives under repair here on 1/10 included Nos. 8, 37, 87, 98, 516/19, 1092, 1107/09/12/24, 60007/18/19/20/60, 60635 an 61120. | SLS/194811 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster MPD (Ex Works on Shed) | Ex Works on Shed: D3326, 60098, 70010, 73012. | SLS/196107 |
18/01/1964 | Bedford MPD (Scrapped) | Since the change over from steam to diesel in August, 1963, this depot has had no regular allocation but from 18th January the official allocation (previously O/L) is D4135/6 an D5379/80/1/2/3. | SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | Shopped: 44722, 61147, 64558/99, 65931, D3548, D6139/53. Scrapped: 60089/98, 60159/62, 60804/38, 64603, 64579, 90058. In shops: 45011, 44880, 45194, 65915, D5328. Being Cut Up: 61177. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/04/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2752, name: SPION KOP Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number l7l0 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
30/06/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5272 | ||
04/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930. | ||
26/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1931. Dep: 15/07/1931. | ||
10/09/1931 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5226 | ||
07/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1932. Dep: 18/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8076 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
29/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1933. Dep: 17/02/1934. | ||
12/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1935. Dep: 23/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8081 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
02/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/12/1935. Dep: 31/12/1935. Work undertaken: Afier Collision |
||
07/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5638 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
22/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/02/1937. Dep: 03/03/1937. | ||
27/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1937. Dep: 28/10/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5580 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
29/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
08/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
02/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1938. Dep: 03/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5267 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939. | ||
17/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. | ||
06/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1941. Dep: 18/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8254 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
23/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1942. Dep: 24/02/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 5481 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
24/02/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
01/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
02/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
16/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
29/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
02/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1944. Dep: 19/07/1944. | ||
20/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1944. Dep: 03/10/1944. | ||
22/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1945. Dep: 04/01/1946. | ||
18/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 561 | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 98 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
16/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
01/03/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
17/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1948. Dep: 03/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27068 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60098 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1950. Dep: 28/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27082 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
06/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
22/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1952. Dep: 24/11/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
11/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1954. Dep: 23/01/1954. | ||
03/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/08/1954. Dep: 10/08/1954. | ||
16/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1954. Dep: 28/01/1955. | ||
25/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/07/1955. Dep: 28/07/1955. | ||
26/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1955. Dep: 01/11/1955. | ||
15/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1956. Dep: 18/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
28/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1958. Dep: 01/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27049 (Diagram 94A) |
||
10/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1958. Dep: 19/12/1958. | ||
01/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1959. Dep: 17/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27023 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
15/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1961. Dep: 25/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29304 (Diagram 107) |
||
06/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
28/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60098 from St Margarets (64A) |