|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1931 | 18/01/1932 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1933 | 03/03/1933 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 8084 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1933 | 15/02/1934 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1934 | 22/09/1934 | 40 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1935 | 29/06/1935 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 8252 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1936 | 08/07/1936 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1937 | 19/03/1937 | 43 days | General | Tender number 5483 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1937 | 14/01/1938 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1938 | 08/03/1938 | 21 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1939 | 18/02/1939 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1940 | 26/03/1940 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8253 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1941 | 14/09/1941 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1943 | 02/04/1943 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9215 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1944 | 21/01/1944 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 31 days | General | Tender number 5643 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1947 | 24/12/1947 | 37 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1949 | 11/11/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 8249 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1949 | 24/11/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1949 | 01/12/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1951 | 14/06/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27048 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1952 | 23/12/1952 | 30 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1954 | 29/04/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1955 | 11/11/1955 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1957 | 20/06/1957 | 42 days | General | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1958 | 05/11/1958 | 41 days | General | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1959 | 11/11/1959 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1960 | 08/06/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29318 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1962 | 27/04/1962 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1962 | Trough deflector fitted A3\'s | Details of two further Class A3 Pacifics equipped with trough-pattern smoke deflectors at Doncaster Works are given below, bringing the total now fitted to thirty-seven : 60078 Night Hawk 3/62, 60085 Manna 4/62. | SLS/196207 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/02/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2596, name: MANNA Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1733 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
30/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1931. Dep: 18/01/1932. | ||
17/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1933. Dep: 03/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8084 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
27/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1933. Dep: 15/02/1934. | ||
14/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/08/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934. | ||
23/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8252 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
20/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1936. Dep: 08/07/1936. | ||
05/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1937. Dep: 19/03/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5483 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
10/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1937. Dep: 14/01/1938. | ||
16/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1938. Dep: 08/03/1938. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
18/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1939. Dep: 18/02/1939. | ||
06/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1940. Dep: 26/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8253 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
06/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1941. Dep: 14/09/1941. | ||
02/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1943. Dep: 02/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9215 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
02/04/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
05/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/01/1944. Dep: 21/01/1944. | ||
14/02/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
31/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
21/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 563 but not taken up | ||
24/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 5643 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
15/03/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5483 | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 85 | ||
18/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1947. Dep: 24/12/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
03/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60085 | ||
03/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1949. Dep: 11/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8249 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
21/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1949. Dep: 24/11/1949. | ||
29/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/11/1949. Dep: 01/12/1949. | ||
15/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1951. Dep: 14/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27048 (Diagram 94A) |
||
24/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1952. Dep: 23/12/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
24/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 29/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) |
||
28/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1955. Dep: 11/11/1955. | ||
10/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1957. Dep: 20/06/1957. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
26/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1958. Dep: 05/11/1958. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
21/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1959. Dep: 11/11/1959. | ||
25/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1960. Dep: 08/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29318 (Diagram 107) |
||
12/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1962. Dep: 27/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Trough deflectors fitted |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60085 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |