|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1931 | 02/07/1931 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1932 | 21/07/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1933 | 16/12/1933 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 8081 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1935 | 14/02/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8721 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1935 | 07/11/1935 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1936 | 20/02/1936 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1936 | 16/06/1936 | 3 days | Unclassified | For trials |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1938 | 05/03/1938 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1938 | 08/08/1938 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1939 | 06/05/1939 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1939 | 06/11/1939 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1940 | 17/08/1940 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 9118 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1942 | 13/06/1942 | 37 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 58 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1947 | 23/05/1947 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 8776 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1947 | 11/11/1947 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1949 | 13/05/1949 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 9213 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1951 | 26/01/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1951 | 02/03/1951 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1952 | 18/06/1952 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1953 | 24/09/1953 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1954 | 25/03/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1954 | 08/11/1954 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1954 | 29/01/1955 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1955 | 12/10/1955 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1956 | 22/12/1956 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1957 | 19/12/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27046 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1958 | 17/10/1958 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1959 | 12/06/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27052 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1960 | 06/01/1961 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29317 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1961 | 20/01/1961 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/04/1930 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5478 | ||
07/04/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2597, name: GAINSBOROUGH Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1736 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
13/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1931. Dep: 02/07/1931. | ||
09/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1932. Dep: 21/07/1932. | ||
31/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8081 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
10/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1935. Dep: 14/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8721 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
25/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1935. Dep: 07/11/1935. | ||
06/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1936. Dep: 20/02/1936. | ||
15/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
14/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/06/1936. Dep: 16/06/1936. Work undertaken: For trials |
||
17/07/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
26/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. | ||
28/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938. | ||
02/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/08/1938. Dep: 08/08/1938. | ||
21/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939. | ||
30/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/10/1939. Dep: 06/11/1939. | ||
02/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
29/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
12/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9118 (Diagram 94A) |
||
08/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
13/06/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
18/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. | ||
08/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. | ||
30/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
20/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 564 but not taken up | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 86 | ||
23/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1947. Dep: 23/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8776 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
07/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1947. Dep: 11/11/1947. | ||
16/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60086 | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
30/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1949. Dep: 13/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9213 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
01/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1951. Dep: 26/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A) |
||
20/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1951. Dep: 02/03/1951. | ||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 18/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
12/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1953. Dep: 24/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
16/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1954. Dep: 25/03/1954. | ||
11/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1954. Dep: 08/11/1954. | ||
22/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955. | ||
29/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1955. Dep: 12/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A) |
||
04/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/12/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956. | ||
11/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1957. Dep: 19/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27046 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1958. Dep: 17/10/1958. | ||
30/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1959. Dep: 12/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27052 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
25/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1960. Dep: 06/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29317 (Diagram 107) |
||
17/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1961. Dep: 20/01/1961. | ||
18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60086 from Neville Hill (55H) |