|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1931 | 31/10/1931 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1932 | 04/01/1933 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1934 | 22/03/1934 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 8082 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1935 | 25/05/1935 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 8223 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1936 | 17/06/1936 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1937 | 06/07/1937 | 44 days | General | Tender number 5571 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1938 | 18/11/1938 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1939 | 15/05/1939 | 5 days | Light Repair | Damaged |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1939 | 16/12/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1941 | 08/08/1941 | 43 days | General | Hudd ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1941 | 28/08/1941 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1942 | 23/09/1942 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/10/1942 | 03/10/1942 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/12/1942 | 27/01/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 8776 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1944 | 25/06/1944 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1945 | 21/10/1945 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1946 | 15/03/1946 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1947 | 22/05/1947 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 8248 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1948 | 20/08/1948 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60101 |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1949 | 02/12/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 8080 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1951 | 20/09/1951 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27057 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1953 | 21/05/1953 | 36 days | General | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 30/12/1953 | 22/01/1954 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 22/07/1954 | 11/08/1954 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1954 | 16/11/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29281 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1955 | 06/01/1956 | 63 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1957 | 29/08/1957 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27029 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1959 | 20/02/1959 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1960 | 18/08/1960 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27011 (Diagram 94A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (On shed, waiting Works) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/05/1930 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5481 | ||
04/06/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2797, name: CICERO Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1742 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
16/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931. | ||
22/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1932. Dep: 04/01/1933. | ||
24/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1934. Dep: 22/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8082 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
18/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8223 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
29/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1936. Dep: 17/06/1936. | ||
15/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
24/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1937. Dep: 06/07/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5571 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
10/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1938. Dep: 18/11/1938. | ||
20/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
11/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1939. Dep: 15/05/1939. Work undertaken: Damaged |
||
03/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1939. Dep: 16/12/1939. | ||
02/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
09/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
27/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1941. Dep: 08/08/1941. Work undertaken: Hudd ATC fitted |
||
21/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1941. Dep: 28/08/1941. | ||
02/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1942. Dep: 23/09/1942. | ||
01/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/10/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942. | ||
24/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1942. Dep: 27/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8776 (Diagram 94A) |
||
24/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1944. Dep: 25/06/1944. | ||
06/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1945. Dep: 21/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 569 but not taken up | ||
06/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/03/1946. Dep: 15/03/1946. | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 101 | ||
18/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. | ||
16/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1947. Dep: 22/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8248 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
09/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1948. Dep: 20/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60101 |
||
31/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1949. Dep: 02/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8080 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
13/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1951. Dep: 20/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27057 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
16/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1953. Dep: 21/05/1953. | ||
30/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1953. Dep: 22/01/1954. | ||
22/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1954. Dep: 11/08/1954. | ||
08/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1954. Dep: 16/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29281 (Diagram 107) |
||
05/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/11/1955. Dep: 06/01/1956. | ||
01/1957 | Modification | Modification: To 75% Cut-off | ||
17/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1957. Dep: 29/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27029 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/1958 | Modification | Modification: Double Chimney fitted | ||
05/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1959. Dep: 20/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A) |
||
28/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1960. Dep: 18/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27011 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/1961 | Modification | Modification: Trough deflectors fitted | ||
06/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
11/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60101 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |