|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1935 | 07/02/1935 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1935 | 19/07/1935 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1935 | 21/12/1935 | 19 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1936 | 24/09/1936 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1937 | 13/11/1937 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1938 | 14/10/1938 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1939 | 08/03/1939 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1940 | 15/03/1940 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1941 | 15/08/1941 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8777 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5261 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1942 | 30/01/1943 | 40 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1944 | 26/08/1944 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1944 | 08/09/1944 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1947 | 12/07/1947 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 8720 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1948 | 27/10/1948 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60037 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1950 | 22/06/1950 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 10541 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5285 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1952 | 19/03/1952 | 35 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1953 | 10/11/1953 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27068 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1953 | 21/12/1953 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1954 | 22/04/1954 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 22/07/1954 | 10/08/1954 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1955 | 05/08/1955 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1956 | 23/06/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/02/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1957 | 18/04/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1957 | 09/05/1957 | 11 days | Light Casual | Tender number 5276 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1958 | 08/10/1958 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27066 (Diagram 94HP) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1959 | 26/09/1959 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1959 | 06/11/1959 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1960 | 15/07/1960 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1962 | 19/05/1962 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 27004 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1963 | 19/07/1963 | 60 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives under repair here on 1/10 included Nos. 8, 37, 87, 98, 516/19, 1092, 1107/09/12/24, 60007/18/19/20/60, 60635 an 61120. | SLS/194811 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
31/07/1962 | A3 trough-pattern smoke deflectors | The number of Class A3 Pacifics fitted with trough-pattern smoke deflectors is forty-three. A further six locos have since been modified at Doncaster Works and includes an additional example, not previously recorded, bringing the total equipped at the time of writing to exactly fifty. 60036 Colombo 7/62, 60066 Merry Hampton 10/61, 60037 Hyperion 5/62, 60075 St. Frusquin 4/62, 60051 Blink Bonny 3/62, 60111 Enterprise 4/62. 60054 Prince of Wales 5/62. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/07/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5570 | ||
25/07/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2502, name: HYPERION Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1792 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 94A boiler fitted |
||
28/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1935. Dep: 07/02/1935. | ||
20/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1935. Dep: 19/07/1935. | ||
03/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1935. Dep: 21/12/1935. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
06/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1936. Dep: 24/09/1936. | ||
11/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1937. Dep: 13/11/1937. | ||
06/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
22/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1938. Dep: 14/10/1938. | ||
27/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1939. Dep: 08/03/1939. | ||
15/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
26/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1940. Dep: 15/03/1940. | ||
27/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1941. Dep: 15/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8777 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5261 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
22/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
30/01/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
28/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1944. Dep: 26/08/1944. | ||
31/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1944. Dep: 08/09/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 572 but not taken up | ||
18/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 37 | ||
04/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1947. Dep: 12/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8720 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
15/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1948. Dep: 27/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60037 |
||
09/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1950. Dep: 22/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10541 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5285 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
22/06/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
14/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1952. Dep: 19/03/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
19/03/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
01/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1953. Dep: 10/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27068 (Diagram 94A) |
||
28/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1953. Dep: 21/12/1953. | ||
07/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (68E) | ||
08/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
25/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1954. Dep: 22/04/1954. | ||
22/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1954. Dep: 10/08/1954. | ||
24/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1955. Dep: 05/08/1955. | ||
25/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956. | ||
14/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957. | ||
11/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1957. Dep: 18/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
29/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1957. Dep: 09/05/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 5276 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
21/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1958. Dep: 08/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27066 (Diagram 94HP) Double Chimney fitted |
||
25/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/08/1959. Dep: 26/09/1959. | ||
26/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 06/11/1959. | ||
18/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1960. Dep: 15/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
06/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
23/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1962. Dep: 19/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27004 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
21/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/05/1963. Dep: 19/07/1963. | ||
12/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60037 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |