|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1935 | 29/01/1936 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1937 | 20/02/1937 | 45 days | Casual | Tender number 5639 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1937 | 19/11/1937 | 38 days | General | Tender number 5229 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1938 | 06/01/1939 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1940 | 03/02/1940 | 14 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1941 | 05/09/1941 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 8782 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5570 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/09/1942 | 01/10/1942 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1943 | 25/08/1943 | 37 days | General | Tender number 5274 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1943 | 12/09/1943 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1946 | 04/01/1947 | 39 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1948 | 12/08/1948 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1949 | 16/12/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9214 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1951 | 17/05/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27046 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1952 | 18/12/1952 | 38 days | General | Tender number 5260 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1954 | 04/11/1954 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1955 | 04/05/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1956 | 08/09/1956 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1958 | 05/09/1958 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1960 | 06/05/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1962 | 05/09/1962 | 90 days | General | Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/12/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2507 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1798 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor Diagram 94A boiler fitted |
||
19/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1935. Dep: 29/01/1936. | ||
07/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5639 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
13/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1937. Dep: 19/11/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5229 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
21/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1938. Dep: 06/01/1939. | ||
21/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940. | ||
07/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1941. Dep: 05/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8782 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5570 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
09/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1942. Dep: 01/10/1942. | ||
20/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1943. Dep: 25/08/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 5274 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
25/08/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
02/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1943. Dep: 12/09/1943. | ||
18/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. | ||
27/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 577 but not taken up | ||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42 | ||
27/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
09/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60042 | ||
14/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1948. Dep: 12/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
15/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1949. Dep: 16/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9214 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
16/12/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
19/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1951. Dep: 17/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27046 (Diagram 94A) |
||
11/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1952. Dep: 18/12/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 5260 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
18/12/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
22/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
05/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
18/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 04/11/1954. | ||
29/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 04/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A) |
||
30/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A) |
||
11/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
05/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
30/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1958. Dep: 05/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
29/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1960. Dep: 06/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) |
||
08/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1962. Dep: 05/09/1962. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
07/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
27/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
13/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60042 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |